THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 3:23:19 AM
Ninan, Ajit Thyparampil
CPSO#:
85397
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Sep 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Sep 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Ross University School of Medicine, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ministry of Children, Community and
Social Services CPRI
600 Sanatorium Road
London ON N6H 3W7
Phone: (519) 858-2774 Ext. 2312
Fax: 5198581917
Electoral District: 02
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Ninan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 18 2019
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:23 Apr 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry |
Effective:27 Sep 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AJIT THYPARAMPIL NINAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NINAN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 2006 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Jul 2006 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 16 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Sep 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Sep 2007 |