skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/10/21 16:10:12 PM

Al-Tatari, Hossam Mohamed

CPSO#: 85380

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 12 Jul 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Medical University of Debrecen, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-5577 Ext. 55534 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Hossam Al-Tatari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 12 2010

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Arab Emirates
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:12 Jul 2006 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jul 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 11 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Feb 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2009 Active
             Dr.   Hossam   Mohamed   Al-Tatari   may  practise  medicine  independently  in
            Paediatrics, only.