THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 19:43:01 PM
Chan, Joseph Edmund
CPSO#:
85369
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Aug 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Aug 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
3251 Sheppard Avenue East
Scarborough ON M1T 3W5
Phone: (416) 546-7000
Fax: (416) 546-5500
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOSEPH EDMUND CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 04 Jul 2006 to 31 Aug 2006
EL - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 2009 |