THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 16:31:15 PM
Parthasarathi, Usha Devi
CPSO#:
85359
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Mar 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Mar 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Tamil
Education: Kasturba Medical College, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
299 Dundas St E
Lotus Counselling Services
Waterdown ON L0R 2H6
Phone: 647-800-1118
Fax: 888-314-3299
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:31 Dec 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. USHA DEVI PARTHASARATHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARTHASARATHI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 08 Jul 2006 to 22 Jul 2006
PEAP - R - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 23 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Mar 2008 |