THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 21:39:00 PM
De Ribaupierre, Sandrine Nathalie
CPSO#:
85341
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Jan 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Academic Practice
as of
20 Jan 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Geneva, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Division of Neurosurgery
Room B1 181
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 58107
Fax: (519) 685-8171
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:02 May 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SANDRINE NATHALIE DE RIBAUPIERRE may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO in which Dr. DE RIBAUPIERRE holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;
(2) Dr. DE RIBAUPIERRE may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);
(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. DE RIBAUPIERRE no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,
(ii) When Dr. DE RIBAUPIERRE no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,
(iii) When Dr. DE RIBAUPIERRE no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 20 Sep 2006
PEAP - CF - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 21 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Neurosurgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Sep 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 31 Jan 2008 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 30 Jun 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Jan 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jan 2015 |