skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 04/12/21 15:18:33 PM

Elmistekawy, El Sayed Mohammed El Sayed Hendawy

CPSO#: 85322

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Tanta University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Cardiac Surgery
University of Ottawa
40 Ruskin Street, H3- 3313A
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 6967000 Ext. 67370
Fax: (613) 6967199 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. El Sayed Elmistekawy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 18 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Elmistekawy ( CPSO# 85322 )

Business Address:
Division of Cardiac Surgery
University of Ottawa
40 Ruskin Street
H3-3313A
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 978-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University of Ottawa,Heart Institute Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective:09 Sep 2021 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 18 Sep 2006
PEAP - CF - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 19 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 14 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 13 Jan 2013
CF - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 14 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jan 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Sep 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 09 Sep 2021 Active
 Dr. EL SAYED MOHAMMED EL SAYED HENDAWY ELMISTEKAWY may practise medicine independently in cardiac surgery.