THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 22:36:57 PM
Dighe, Krupa Hasmukh
CPSO#:
85298
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Jul 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Mali, Krupa Hasmukh (used until: 13 Jun 2009 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi, Marathi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: University of Mumbai, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
4440 Tecumseh Rd E
Windsor ON N8W 1K5
Phone: 519 916 0993
Fax: 519 916 0994
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:06 May 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:24 Sep 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KRUPA HASMUKH DIGHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIGHE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 08 Sep 2006
AVP - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 09 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Sep 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jul 2012 |