skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 28/09/22 17:45:22 PM

Kilani, Mehrak

CPSO#: 85278

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Moradhamzehe Kilani, Mehrak (used until: 29 Apr 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education: Tehran University of Medical Sciences Sc, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5-630 Huronia Rd
Barrie ON  L4N 0W5
Phone: 7057288040
Fax: 7057281676 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

3-7869 Yonge St
Innisfil ON  L9S 1K8
Canada
Phone: 7055589526
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Mehrak Kilani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 09 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kilani ( CPSO# 85278 )

Business Address:
5-630 Huronia Rd
Barrie ON  L4N 0W5
Phone Number: 7057288040

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MEHRAK KILANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KILANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 23 Sep 2006
AVP - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011