skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 28/07/21 20:41:33 PM

Settecase, Fabio

CPSO#: 85257

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Aug 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 08 Aug 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:Boston University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Radiology
Vancouver General Hospital
Jim Pattison Pavilion South,
899 West 12th Street, Room G861
Vancouver BC  V5Z 1M9
Phone: (604) 875-4111 Ext. 63711

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Settecase Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 10 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia
USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 08 Aug 2012 Active
 Dr. Fabio Settecase may practice medicine independently in Diagnostic
            Radiology, only.