THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 1:11:28 AM
Lee Chong, Amy Patricia Lee Kwee Lan
CPSO#:
85251
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
25 Industrial St
Toronto ON M4G 1Z2
Phone: 416-429-0202
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Ireland
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:02 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Pediatric Hematology/Oncology |
Effective:24 Sep 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AMY PATRICIA LEE KWEE LAN LEE CHONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE CHONG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 25 Aug 2006
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 26 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 Jul 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 May 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2014 |