skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/10/21 14:48:25 PM

Kumar, Vikaash Naveen Chandra

CPSO#: 85216

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: 905-472-7068
Fax: 905-472-7046 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Canada
Phone: 416-946-2260
Fax: 416-946-6546
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Vikaash N.C. Kumar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 16 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Kumar ( CPSO# 85216 )

Business Address:
377 Church Street
Suite 306
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone Number: (905) 472-7072

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective:27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VIKAASH NAVEEN CHANDRA KUMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUMAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2010