THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/10/23 9:01:03 AM
Reka, Altin
CPSO#:
85196
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
18 May 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Albanian, English
Education: Universiteti i Tiranes, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Real Health
800 Niagara St. North , Unit G1
Welland ON L3C 5Z4
Phone: (905) 732-4451
Fax: (905) 732-1330
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Jun 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 2008 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 May 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member |
Effective: 18 May 2011 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
member |
Effective: 18 May 2011 |
|
Active |