THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 3:12:32 AM
Rajabalee, Mahmud Ahmad
CPSO#:
85170
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Aug 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Aug 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Creole, English, French
Education: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
188 St Clair Street
Chatham ON N7L 3J6
Phone: (519) 397-4753
Fax: (519) 397-4518
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Chatham Public General Hospital Society |
Chatham |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:03 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MAHMUD AHMAD RAJABALEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJABALEE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
AVP - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Aug 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 2010 |