skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 29/07/21 7:10:44 AM

Siddique, Saquib Mohammed

CPSO#: 85152

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Nov 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 May 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Kannada, Konkani, Marathi, Urdu

Education:Bangalore University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Advance Endoscopy Centre
Unit - 303
2227 South Millway
Mississauga ON  L5L 3R6
Phone: 905 569 7007 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

RUDD CLINIC
Unit - 400
123 Edward Street
Toronto M5G 1E2
Canada
Phone: 416 597 0997
County: 
Electoral District: 

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SAQUIB MOHAMMED SIDDIQUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDDIQUE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 May 2021