THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/09/23 3:43:03 AM
Famorca, Leilani Casilda de Leon
CPSO#:
85121
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Sep 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Filipino
Education: SAINT LOUIS UNIVERSITY, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
336 Bronte Street South
Suite 223
Milton ON L9T 7W6
Phone: (289) 851-0774
Fax: (289) 851-0776
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:27 Sep 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LEILANI CASILDA DE LEON FAMORCA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAMORCA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 21 Sep 2006
AVP - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 22 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Sep 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Sep 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2010 |