THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 10:16:54 AM
Ahmed, Itrat Tahira
CPSO#:
85081
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Jan 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Jan 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: University of the Punjab, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street
Orillia ON L3V 2Z3
Phone: 705-325-2201 Ext. 3597
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Brunswick
Pakistan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital |
Orillia |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ITRAT TAHIRA AHMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMED is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 25 Aug 2006
AVP - General Pathology
University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jan 2019 |