THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
06/12/23 10:14:57 AM
Kwok, Edmund Sai Hong
CPSO#:
85047
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Jan 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jan 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English
Education: Queen's University, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
E Main Room M 206 Box 227
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 19002
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,General Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:16 May 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EDMUND SAI HONG KWOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWOK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Aug 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jun 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Oct 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Oct 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Jan 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jan 2013 |