THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/09/23 2:56:30 AM
El Gouhary, Enas El Gouhary Abou El Hassan
CPSO#:
85036
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
Neonatal Intensive Care Unit
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73489
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine |
Effective:24 Sep 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ENAS EL GOUHARY ABOU EL HASSAN EL GOUHARY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL GOUHARY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 24 Aug 2006
AVP - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 25 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Aug 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Aug 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2010 |