THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 20:44:51 PM
Scheer, Adena Sarah
CPSO#:
85012
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jul 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond St. Rm 3-005 Donnelly Wing
Toronto, ON
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5804
Fax: (416) 864-5821
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
General Surgical Oncology |
Effective:23 Sep 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ADENA SARAH SCHEER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHEER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Surgical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Surgical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 2012 |