THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 6:17:15 AM
Girlan, Larisa Mirela
CPSO#:
85007
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Dec 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Dec 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Institute Medicine,Pharmacy,Tirgu-Mures, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
64 Cameron Street East, P.O. Box 69
Cannington ON L0E 1E0
Phone: 705-432-3388
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Larisa Girlan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 28 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:10 Dec 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LARISA MIRELA GIRLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIRLAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 25 Aug 2006
AVP - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 26 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Aug 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Sep 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Dec 2008 |