THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 15:56:38 PM
Grover, Harpreet Singh
CPSO#:
84970
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 132
150 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON L9W 4X8
Phone: (519) 938-5644
Fax: (519) 938-5641
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Headwaters Health Care Centre |
Orangeville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HARPREET SINGH GROVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GROVER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Dec 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2011 |