THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 3:16:36 AM
Tahir, Ferhana
CPSO#:
84959
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Dec 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Dec 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: Nishtar Medical College, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ritson North Medical centre
Unit #9
1288 Ritson road north
Oshawa ON L1G 7Z9
Phone: 905-240-7662
Fax: 289-731-2064
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:22 Dec 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FERHANA TAHIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAHIR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 13 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 14 Dec 2007 to 13 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Dec 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Dec 2008 |