THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 10:55:35 AM
Kolobov, Anton
CPSO#:
84947
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Sep 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Sep 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian
Education: Ural State Medical Academy, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Hospital
P.O. Box 3251
35 North Algoma Street
Thunder Bay ON P7B 5G7
Phone: (807) 346-2310
Fax: (807) 345-5126
Electoral District: 09
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay |
Thunder Bay |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:13 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:26 Feb 2015 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANTON KOLOBOV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOLOBOV is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Jun 2006 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Jun 2006 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 20 Jun 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Sep 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Sep 2008 |