THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 5:55:39 AM
Xu, Haibo
CPSO#:
84946
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English, Mandarin
Education: Beijing Medical University, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1-250 Argyle St N
Caledonia ON N3W 1K9
Phone: 9057651686
Fax: 8559480986
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:18 Jun 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HAIBO XU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. XU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 25 Aug 2006
AVP - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 26 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 2008 |