THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 18:52:22 PM
Chinnappa, Vinod
CPSO#:
84937
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Sep 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Sep 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Bangalore University, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health System
Department of Anaesthesia
2100, Bovaird Dr E,
Brampton ON, L6R 3J5
Brampton ON L6R3J5
Phone: 905 494 2120 Ext. 58439
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Vinod Chinnappa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 9 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:07 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VINOD CHINNAPPA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHINNAPPA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Aug 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Nov 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Sep 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Sep 2017 |