skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 05/08/21 7:34:02 AM

Retson, Jillie Elizabeth Marie

CPSO#: 84908

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lake of the Woods District Hospital
21 Sylvan Street
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone: (807) 468-9861 Ext. page Electoral District: 09

Additional Practice Location(s)

240 Veterans Dr
Kenora ON  P9N 3Y5
Canada
Phone: 807-467-8144
Fax: 807-467-2656
County: District of Kenora
Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jillie Retson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Retson ( CPSO# 84908 )

Business Address:
21 Sylvan Street
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone Number: (807) 468-9861

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:13 Aug 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JILLIE ELIZABETH MARIE RETSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RETSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 17 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2009