THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 19:50:04 PM
Garcia Gelvez, Claudia Marcela
CPSO#:
84894
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Aug 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Aug 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Universidad El Bosque, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:15 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CLAUDIA MARCELA GARCIA GELVEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARCIA GELVEZ is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 23 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Sep 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Aug 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Oct 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Aug 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Aug 2016 |