THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/09/23 4:41:30 AM
Abbud, Saad
CPSO#:
84891
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jun 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Abbud, Saad Lahoob (used until: 19 Jul 2017 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Baghdad College of Medicin, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Barrhaven Medical Centre
10 - 2900 Woodroffe Ave
Nepean ON K2J 4G3
Phone: (613) 440-3600
Fax: (613) 440-3605
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:20 Jun 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SAAD ABBUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABBUD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 2008 |