THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/09/23 0:56:41 AM
Sajed, Sina
CPSO#:
84882
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jul 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Institute of Medicine, Pharmacy,Iasi, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Courtice Health Centre
1450 Hwy #2
Oshawa ON L1E 3C3
Phone: 905-721-2760
Fax: 905-721-2566
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:23 Jun 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SINA SAJED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAJED is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 25 Aug 2006
AVP - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 26 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 2008 |