THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 8:24:49 AM
Cooke, Kristy Anne Martha
CPSO#:
84846
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Dec 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Dec 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 17000
33 CF Health Services Centre
Kingston ON K7K 5L0
Phone: 613-541-5010
Electoral District: 06
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Kristy A M Cooke Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 18 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:14 Dec 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KRISTY ANNE MARTHA COOKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOKE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jan 2010 to 20 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 21 Jun 2010 to 20 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 21 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Nov 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Dec 2011 |