THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 13:02:53 PM
Mottaghian, Mojgan
CPSO#:
84843
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Persian
Education: Islamic Azad University, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Phone: 905-417-20000
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOJGAN MOTTAGHIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOTTAGHIAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Apr 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 May 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 24 Apr 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 25 Apr 2009 to 24 Apr 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 25 Apr 2010 to 24 Apr 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 25 Apr 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2012 |