skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/10/21 13:38:25 PM

Peirovy, Javad

CPSO#: 84832

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 21 Apr 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Azari, English, Farsi

Education:University of Tehran, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ultimate Diagnostics
298 Sheppard Ave E
North York ON  M3N 3B1
Phone: (416) 223-6500 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J. Peirovy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Apr 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 21 Apr 2011
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 30 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 23 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 27 Apr 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 27 Apr 2016
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 27 Oct 2016
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 17 Jan 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 30 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 03 May 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 20 May 2018
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 19 Apr 2019
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 19 Jun 2019
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 22 Apr 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 22 Apr 2020 Active
             (1 of 2)
            As  from  April  22,  2020,  the following are imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate  of  registration  held  by Dr. Javad Peirovy in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Peirovy  to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. JAVAD PEIROVY
                                          ("Dr. Peirovy")
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                                                                                     

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is  Schedule 2
                  to  the  Regulated  Health  Professions  Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18,  as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints  and Reports Committee of
                  the College; 
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that  is  available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Peirovy, certificate of registration number 84832,  am a member of
                  the College. 

            (3)   I,  Dr.  Peirovy, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation
                  bearing File  Number 1101323 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
                  in professional misconduct practice, including with respect to delegation
                  of controlled acts,  and  in  my compliance with my undertakings with the
                  College.  

            (4)   I, Dr. Peirovy, acknowledge that,  if the ICRC approves this Undertaking,
                  the College will also deliver a caution in person.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Peirovy, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective upon the date the Undertaking  is approved by the ICR Committee
                  (the "Effective Date"). 

            (6)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Peirovy, undertake that I shall not delegate controlled acts
                        (as defined in the Regulated Health  Professions  Act,  1991),  nor
                        permit  individuals  who  are not regulated health professionals to
                        conduct   assessments,   take  histories,   or   conduct   physical
                        examinations of patients,  until  such time as I have completed the
                        Professional Education outlined in  section  (7) below, and receive
                        direction  in  writing from the College that this  restriction  had
                        been removed. 
                  
                  (b)   I,  Dr.  Peirovy,   undertake  that  following  completion  of  the
                        Professional Education  in section (7) below, I will maintain a log
                        of all controlled acts that  I have delegated at any of my practice
                        locations,  and  all  acts performed  under  an  order  or  medical
                        directive (the "Delegation  Log")  in the form outlined in Appendix
                        "A", which shall be submitted to the  College  on  a  monthly basis
                        until  the  completion  of  the  reassessment of my practice  under
                        section (8) of this Undertaking. 
                  
            (7)   Professional Education 

                  (a)   I,  Dr.  Peirovy,  undertake  to participate  in  and  successfully
                        complete  all  aspects  of the detailed  IEP,  attached  hereto  as
                        Appendix "B", including all of the following professional education
                        (the "Professional Education"): 
                  
                        (i)   Review  and  a  written   summary  of  CPSO's  Delegation  of
                              Controlled Acts policy; 
                        (ii)  Review of
                  
                              1.    CPSO's  Practice  Guide:  Medical  Professionalism  and
                                    College Policies; and
                              2.    the Canadian Medical Association's Code of Ethics.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Peirovy, acknowledge that the College will determine, in its
                        sole  discretion,  whether  I  have   successfully   completed  the
                        Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Peirovy, undertake to complete this requirement within three
                        (3) months of the Effective Date.
                  
            (8)   Reassessment of Practice 

                  (a)   I,  Dr.  Peirovy,  undertake  that, approximately three (3)  months
                        after  the  completion of the Professional  Education  set  out  in
                        section (7) above,  I  will submit to a reassessment of my practice
                        ("the Reassessment") by  an  assessor  or assessors selected by the
                        College (the "Assessor" or "Assessors").   I  acknowledge  that the
                        Reassessment  will  include  review  of  a  minimum of fifteen (15)
                        charts selected from my Delegation Log or, if  fewer than 15 exist,
                        such lesser number, and may include direct observation  of my care,
                        interviews  with  me,  colleagues  and  co-workers,  feedback  from
                        patients, and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I,   Dr.   Peirovy,   undertake   to   co-operate  fully  with  the
                        Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Peirovy, acknowledge that the results  of  the  Reassessment
                        will  be  provided  to  me  and  reported  to  the  College and the
                        Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
            (9)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Peirovy, undertake to inform the College of each  and  every
                        location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited  to,  any  hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
                        Health Facilities with  which  I  am  affiliated,  as  well  as any
                        locations  in  which I act as medical director, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my  "Practice  Location"  or  "Practice  Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward,
                        I  further  undertake  to  inform  the  College of any and all  new
                        Practice Locations within five (5) days of  commencing  practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Peirovy, undertake that I will submit to, and not  interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and  patient
                        charts  by  a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Peirovy,  give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries  of OHIP and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information,  in  order  for  the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I,  Dr. Peirovy, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP  consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "C".
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (10)  I, Dr. Peirovy,  acknowledge  that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (11)  I,  Dr.  Peirovy,  acknowledge and  undertake  that  I  shall  be  solely
                  responsible for payment  of  all  fees,  costs,  charges,  expenses, etc.
                  arising  from  the  implementation  of  any  of  the  provisions of  this
                  Undertaking. 

            (12)  I,  Dr.  Peirovy,  acknowledge  that  I  have  read  and  understand  the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel  in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have  waived  my
                  right to do so.

            (13)  I,  Dr.  Peirovy,   acknowledge   that  the  College  will  provide  this
                  Undertaking  to  any  Chief  of  Staff,   or  a  colleague  with  similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location  ("Chief  of Staff" or "Chiefs
                  of Staff").

            (14)  I, Dr. Peirovy, acknowledge that a breach by me of any  provision of this
                  Undertaking  may  constitute  an  act  of professional misconduct  and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral  of  specified  allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (15)  I,  Dr.  Peirovy,  acknowledge  that this Undertaking constitutes  terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my  certificate  of  registration  for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (16)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Peirovy, acknowledge that, during the time period that  this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted  on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I,  Dr.  Peirovy, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being  posted   in  accordance  with  section  (16)(a)  above,  the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A  College  investigation  was  conducted  into  whether  Dr.
                              Peirovy engaged  in  professional  misconduct  including with
                              respect to delegation of controlled acts, and his  compliance
                              with  his undertakings with the College. As a result  of  the
                              investigation: 
                  
                                    Dr.  Peirovy will not delegate any controlled acts, nor
                                    permit   individuals   who  are  not  regulated  health
                                    professionals to conduct  assessments,  take histories,
                                    or conduct physical examinations of patients, until the
                                    completion of professional education.
                  
                                    Dr.  Peirovy  will engage in professional education  in
                                    the appropriate delegation of controlled acts. 
                  
                                    Dr. Peirovy will undergo a reassessment of his practice
                                    3  months  after   the   completion   of   professional
                                    education. 
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (17)  I, Dr. Peirovy, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs  of  Staff  with any information the College has that led  to  the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring  of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (2 of 2)
            As from 11:59 p.m., May 3,  2018,  by  order of the Discipline Committee of the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario  on April 27, 2016, the following
            terms,  conditions  and  limitations  are  imposed  on   the   certificate   of
            registration held by Dr. Javad Peirovy:

            Practice Monitor
            a)    Dr.  Peirovy  shall not engage in any professional encounters with female
                  patients of any  age  unless  the  patient  encounter  takes place in the
                  presence  of  a  monitor  who  is  a female member of a regulated  health
                  profession and who is acceptable to the College (the "Practice Monitor"),
                  to be reconsidered upon application to the Committee by Dr. Peirovy after
                  a  minimum  of  one  year  following his  return  to  practice  once  his
                  suspension has ended;

            b)    At all times, Dr. Peirovy shall ensure that the Practice Monitor shall:
                  i.    Remain in the examination  room  or  consultation room at all times
                        during all professional encounters with  all  female patients, even
                        if another person is accompanying the patient; 
                  
                  ii.   Carefully observe all of his physical examinations  (including  but
                        not  limited  to  breast  and  chest  examinations)  of  all female
                        patients, with an unobstructed view of the examination;

                  iii.  Refrain from performing any other functions, except those  required
                        in the Practice Monitor's undertaking attached as Appendix "A" (the
                        "Practice  Monitor's Undertaking"), while observing him in all  his
                        professional encounters with female patients;
                  
                  iv.   Keep a patient  log  in  the  form attached as Appendix "B" to this
                        Order of all the female patients  with  whom  Dr.  Peirovy  has  an
                        in-person professional encounter in the Practice Monitor's presence
                        (the "Log");
                  
                  v.    Initial  the  corresponding  entry  in  the records of each patient
                        noted in the Log to confirm that the Practice  Monitor  was  in the
                        presence  of  Dr. Peirovy at all times during each female in-person
                        professional encounter;
                  
                  vi.   Submit the original Log to the College on a monthly basis; and
                  
                  vii.  Provide  reports   (as   described   in   the   Practice  Monitor's
                        Undertaking) to the College on at least a monthly basis.

            c)    Dr. Peirovy shall maintain a copy of the Log at all times, and shall make
                  it available to the College upon request;

            Notification of Practice Locations 
            d)    Dr. Peirovy shall inform the College of each and every  location  that he
                  practices  including,  but  not  limited  to,  hospital(s), clinic(s) and
                  office(s), in any jurisdiction (collectively the "Practice Location(s)"),
                  within fifteen (15) days of this Order. Going forward,  he  shall  inform
                  the  College  of  any  and all new Practice Locations within fifteen (15)
                  days of commencing practice at that location; 

            Posting a Sign 
            e)    Dr. Peirovy shall post a  sign  in  his  waiting  room(s) and each of his
                  examination and/or consulting rooms, in all of his Practice Locations, in
                  a  clearly visible and secure location, in the form  attached  hereto  as
                  Appendix "C"; 

            f)    r. Peirovy  shall  provide patients with a guide to access the Discipline
                  Committee's decision in this matter, if requested;

            Monitoring 
            g)    Dr. Peirovy shall consent  to the College making appropriate enquiries of
                  the Ontario Health Insurance  Plan  and/or  any person or institution who
                  may have relevant information in order for the  College  to  monitor  Dr.
                  Peirovy's compliance with the terms of this Order and shall promptly sign
                  such  consents  as may be necessary for the College to obtain information
                  from these persons or institutions;

            h)    Dr.  Peirovy  shall  submit  to,  and  not  interfere  with,  unannounced
                  inspections of  his  Practice  Locations  and  to  inspections of patient
                  charts  by  the  College  and  to  any other activity the  College  deems
                  necessary,  including  simulated  patients,   in  order  to  monitor  Dr.
                  Peirovy's compliance with the terms of this Order;

            i)    Dr.  Peirovy  shall  consent  to  the  College  providing   any  and  all
                  information  to the Practice Monitor that the College deems necessary  or
                  desirable in order  to  assist  the  Practice  Monitor  in fulfilling her
                  Undertaking  and  in order to monitor Dr. Peirovy's compliance  with  the
                  terms of this Order; and

            j)    Dr. Peirovy shall consent  to  all  Practice  Monitors  disclosing to the
                  College,  and  to  one another, any information relevant to  this  Order,
                  relevant  to the terms  of  the  Practice  Monitor's  Undertaking  and/or
                  relevant for  the  purposes  of  monitoring Dr. Peirovy's compliance with
                  this Order;

            Individualized Instruction 
            k)    Dr. Peirovy continue to undergo individualized  instruction with Dr. D on
                  issues  of  consent,  the maintenance of boundaries,  and  doctor/patient
                  communication, and that  Dr.  D  report  to  the College on Dr. Peirovy's
                  progress each six months, with a final report  to  follow  prior  to  her
                  termination   of   instruction  with  Dr.  Peirovy.  Termination  of  the
                  individualized instruction shall be at the discretion of Dr. D;

            Clinical Education Program
            l)    Dr. Peirovy shall, within  90  days of the commencement of the suspension
                  of his certificate of registration,  meet  with  a physician advisor from
                  the  College  to establish a clinical education program,  directed  by  a
                  supervisor acceptable  to  the  College,  regarding the issue of physical
                  examination, with particular focus on issues of the sexual privacy of and
                  sensitivity to female patients.

            m)    All the above terms and conditions to be at Dr. Peirovy's expense.

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 26 Feb 2018
Summary:

On February 26, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Javad Peirovy committed 
an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or 
omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all of the 
circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
dishonorable, or unprofessional. 
 
Patient A  
 
Dr. Peirovy is a general practitioner, who was working in a walk-in clinic in 2009. Patient 
A, a single woman in her twenties, saw him for a minor ailment. She was assessed by 
Dr. Peirovy in a brief interview involving history and physical examination. During the 
examination, she partially lifted her shirt up while he palpated her abdomen but was 
otherwise fully clothed. Patient A and Dr. Peirovy shared a cultural background and 
language. At the end of the medical appointment, he gave her his cell phone number. 
When she left the appointment, Patient A expected that she and Dr. Peirovy would date. 
Nothing was said about dating or ending the doctor-patient relationship during the 
appointment. Patient A did not consider Dr. Peirovy her doctor after the appointment. 
 
Two days later Patient A called Dr. Peirovy, and over the ensuing two weeks, they 
telephoned each other often, before going on a date. They developed a one and a half 
year relationship that was characterized by mutual respect and consideration, though 
there were several breakups. The relationship included holding hands, hugging, kissing 
and physical sexual touching, but no intercourse. Patient A eventually broke off the 
relationship.  
 
At one point, Dr. Peirovy mentioned to Patient A his concern regarding how they first 
met, that is that it occurred during a medical encounter. He suggested he wanted her to 
sign a document because of his worry that the way they met was not right, was 
unethical. He did not follow through with this.  
 
Decision 
 
The Committee found that Dr. Peirovy engaged in conduct relevant to practice of 
medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by 
members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, by using his medical office to 
initiate a social relationship with a young female patient by giving her his personal cell 
phone number at her medical appointment with him.  
 
Penalty and Costs 
 
The Committee held a penalty hearing on August 21 and September 18, 2018, and 
reserved decision.  In its decision released on March 20, 2019, the Committee made the 
following Order on Penalty and Costs: 
 
 
1.    The Registrar suspend Dr. Peirovy’s certificate of registration for a period of two 
(2) months, to commence 30 days from the date of this Order; 
 
2.    Dr. Peirovy shall appear before the panel to be reprimanded within 60 days of the 
date of this Order; 
 
3.    Dr. Peirovy pay to the College costs in the amount of $28,610 within 45 days of 
the date of this Order.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): August 21 to 23, 2017 Penalty hearing date: August 21, 2018

 

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 17 Jul 2015
Summary:

On July 17, 2015, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Javad Peirovy committed acts of 
professional misconduct in that:  he engaged in the sexual abuse of patients; he engaged in 
conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
unprofessional; and, he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to 
practise. 
 
The Discipline Committee found that Dr. Peirovy sexually abused four patients, Ms. U, Ms. V, 
 Ms. W, and Ms. X.  
  
 Regarding Ms. U, the Committee found that Dr. Peirovy placed his stethoscope directly on her 
 nipples and cupped her breasts with his hand, that he did not have consent to touch his patient in 
 this manner and that there was no clinical reason to examine Ms. U in this way. The cupping of 
 her breasts with his hand and the placing of the stethoscope directly on her nipples are actions 
 which, to the objective observer, would be construed as sexual in nature. Regardless of Dr. 
 Peirovy’s motivation, this deliberate touching of the nipples and breasts during a chest 
examination was a violation of Ms. U’s sexual integrity and constitutes sexual abuse.  
 Regarding Ms. V, the Committee found that Dr. Peirovy placed his stethoscope directly on her 
 nipples during the course of his examination, that he did not have consent to touch his patient in 
 this manner and that there was no clinical reason to examine Ms. V in this way. The placing of 
 the stethoscope directly on her nipples would, to the objective observer, be construed as sexual in 
 nature. Regardless of Dr. Peirovy’s motivation, this deliberate touching of her nipples during a 
 chest examination was a violation of Ms. V sexual integrity and constitutes sexual abuse. 
 
Regarding Ms. W, the Committee found that Dr. Peirovy touched her nipples with his fingers 
during the course of his examination, that Dr. Peirovy did not have consent to touch his patient in 
this manner and that there was no clinical reason to examine Ms. W in this way. The touching of 
her nipples, to the objective observer, would be construed as sexual in nature. Regardless of Dr. 
Peirovy’s motivation, the deliberate touching of her nipples during a chest examination was a 
violation of Ms. W’s sexual integrity and constitutes sexual abuse. 
  
 Regarding Ms. X, the Committee found that during the course of his examination Dr. Peirovy 
 cupped her breasts and used his fingers to put pressure on her nipples, which she described as 
 “tweaking”, that Dr. Peirovy did not have consent to touch his patient in this manner and that 
 there was no clinical reason to examine Ms. X in this way. The cupping of her breasts with his 
 hand and “tweaking” of her nipples are actions which, to the objective observer, would be 
 construed as sexual in nature. Regardless of Dr. Peirovy’s motivation, the deliberate touching of 
 her breasts and nipples during a chest examination was a violation of Ms. X’s sexual integrity. 
  
 The Committee found that Dr. Peirovy’s conduct with respect to these four patients, Ms. U, Ms. 
 V, Ms. W, and Ms. X, would also reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
 dishonourable, or unprofessional. 
  
 Regarding a fifth patient, Ms. Z, Dr. Peirovy conducted a cardiac examination during which Ms. 
 Z’s breasts were left fully exposed due to a miscommunication between Dr. Peirovy and Ms. Z. 
 The Committee stated it was Dr. Peirovy’s responsibility as the physician to take steps to ensure 
effective communication with respect to a sensitive examination of this nature and that he did not 
discharge this responsibility effectively. Further, when Dr. Peirovy realized that Ms. Z’s breasts 
were fully exposed, his decision to proceed with the examination without offering her privacy, 
by way of a gown for example, was a serious lapse of judgment. Regardless of time constraints 
or other issues, Dr. Peirovy should have recognized the vulnerable and compromised situation of 
Ms. Z, and responded in a more professional manner by assisting in preserving her modesty. The 
Committee found his conduct in this regard unprofessional. Following the examination, Dr. 
Peirovy engaged Ms. Z in conversation which culminated in asking her out on a date. He told her 
that she would have to sign a note for her chart terminating the doctor/patient relationship, if they 
were to see each other outside the office. Dr. Peirovy demonstrated egregiously poor judgment in 
suggesting to Ms. Z that they could see each other socially, in the context of just having 
compromised her privacy due to the ill-advised fashion in which he had examined her. The 
Committee found this conduct would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
dishonourable or unprofessional. 
 
The Discipline Committee also found that Dr. Peirovy has been found guilty of offences relevant 
to his suitability to practise in that he was found guilty of assault on Ms. U and Ms. W. The 
Court imposed a conditional discharge and eighteen months’ probation, with conditions 
including that Dr. Peirovy attend counselling with Dr. D, perform community service, make a 
charitable donation, and have no contact with the six complainants in these proceedings. 
PENALTY AND COSTS 
On April 27, 2016, The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
1. The Registrar suspend Dr. Peirovy’s certificate of registration for a period of six months, 
   effective as of the date of this order at 11:59 pm. 
       
2. The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitation of Dr. Peirovy’s 
   certificate of registration: 
 
Practice Monitor 
   a) Dr. Peirovy shall not engage in any professional encounters with female patients of any 
      age unless the patient encounter takes place in the presence of a monitor who is a female 
      member of a regulated health profession and who is acceptable to the College (the 
      “Practice Monitor”), to be reconsidered upon application to the Committee by Dr. 
      Peirovy after a minimum of one year following his return to practice once his suspension 
      has ended; 
       
   b) At all times, Dr. Peirovy shall ensure that the Practice Monitor shall: 
       i.   Remain in the examination room or consultation room at all times during all 
            professional encounters with all female patients, even if another person is 
            accompanying the patient;  
       ii.  Carefully observe all of his physical examinations (including but not limited to 
            breast and chest examinations) of all female patients, with an unobstructed view 
            of the examination;  
      iii.  Refrain from performing any other functions, except those required in the Practice 
            Monitor’s undertaking attached as Appendix “A” (the “Practice Monitor’s 
            Undertaking”), while observing him in all his professional encounters with female 
            patients; 
      iv.   Keep a patient log in the form attached as Appendix “B” to this Order of all the 
            female patients with whom Dr. Peirovy has an in-person professional encounter in 
            the Practice Monitor’s presence (the “Log”); 
       v.   Initial the corresponding entry in the records of each patient noted in the Log to 
            confirm that the Practice Monitor was in the presence of Dr. Peirovy at all times 
            during each female in-person professional encounter; 
      vi.   Submit the original Log to the College on a monthly basis; and 
      vii.  Provide reports (as described in the Practice Monitor’s Undertaking) to the 
            College on at least a monthly basis.  
   c) Dr. Peirovy shall maintain a copy of the Log at all times, and shall make it available to 
      the College upon request; 
       
Notification of Practice Locations  
   d) Dr. Peirovy shall inform the College of each and every location that he practices 
      including, but not limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction 
      (collectively the “Practice Location(s)”), within fifteen (15) days of this Order. Going 
      forward, he shall inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within fifteen 
      (15) days of commencing practice at that location;  
 
Posting a Sign  
   e) Dr. Peirovy shall post a sign in his waiting room(s) and each of his examination and/or 
      consulting rooms, in all of his Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, 
      in the form attached hereto as Appendix “C”;  
   f) Dr. Peirovy shall provide patients with a guide to access the Discipline Committee’s 
      decision in this matter, if requested; 
 
Monitoring  
   g) Dr. Peirovy shall consent to the College making appropriate enquiries of the Ontario 
      Health Insurance Plan and/or any person or institution who may have relevant 
      information in order for the College to monitor Dr. Peirovy’s compliance with the terms 
      of this Order and shall promptly sign such consents as may be necessary for the College 
      to obtain information from these persons or institutions; 
   h) Dr. Peirovy shall submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of his 
      Practice Locations and to inspections of patient charts by the College and to any other 
      activity the College deems necessary, including simulated patients, in order to monitor 
      Dr. Peirovy’s compliance with the terms of this Order; 
   i) Dr. Peirovy shall consent to the College providing any and all information to the Practice 
      Monitor that the College deems necessary or desirable in order to assist the Practice 
      Monitor in fulfilling her Undertaking and in order to monitor Dr. Peirovy’s compliance 
      with the terms of this Order; and 
   j) Dr. Peirovy shall consent to all Practice Monitors disclosing to the College, and to one 
      another, any information relevant to this Order, relevant to the terms of the Practice 
      Monitor’s Undertaking and/or relevant for the purposes of monitoring Dr. Peirovy’s 
      compliance with this Order; 
       
Individualized Instruction  
   k) Dr. Peirovy continue to undergo individualized instruction with Dr. D on issues of 
      consent, the maintenance of boundaries, and doctor/patient communication, and that Dr. 
      D report to the College on Dr. Peirovy’s progress each six months, with a final report to 
      follow prior to her termination of instruction with Dr. Peirovy. Termination of the 
      individualized instruction shall be at the discretion of Dr. D; 
 
Clinical Education Program 
   l) Dr. Peirovy shall, within 90 days of the commencement of the suspension of his 
      certificate of registration, meet with a physician advisor from the College to establish a 
      clinical education program, directed by a supervisor acceptable to the College, regarding 
      the issue of physical examination, with particular focus on issues of the sexual privacy of 
      and sensitivity to female patients. 
   m) All the above terms and conditions to be at Dr. Peirovy’s expense. 
 
3. Dr. Peirovy reimburse the College for funding for patients therapy, pursuant to the program 
   required under section 85.7 of the Code, and that he post an irrevocable letter of credit or 
   other security acceptable to the College to guarantee payment, in the amount of $64,240.00. 
    
4. Dr. Peirovy appear before the Committee to be reprimanded, not later than six months from 
   the date this Order becomes final. 
 
5. Dr. Peirovy pay costs to the College in the amount of $35,680.00 within sixty (60) days of 
   the date of this Order. 
 
6. In light of the fact that this Order is different form the penalty proposed by either party, the 
   parties have ten days from the date of this Order to make written submissions with respect to 
   any issues related to the implementation of this Order.  To be clear, the Panel is not inviting 
   submissions with respect to the substance of this Order or the start date of the period of 
   suspension, but simply wishes to provide the parties with an opportunity to address any 
   potential difficulties with the implementation of this Order which may not have been 
   apparent to the Committee.   
 
APPEALS 
On August 7, 2015, Dr. Peirovy appealed the decision on finding of the Discipline Committee to 
the Superior Court of Justice (Divisional Court). 

On May 24, 2016, the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario appealed the decision on 
penalty of the Discipline Committee to the Superior Court of Justice (Divisional Court). 

On June 27, 2016, Dr. Peirovy abandoned his appeal to the Superior Court of Justice (Divisional 
Court). 

On January 17, 2017, the Divisional Court granted the College’s appeal of the penalty decision, 
quashed the penalty imposed and remitted the matter to the Discipline Committee to impose a 
penalty. Pending the disposition of penalty by the Discipline Committee Dr. Peirovy’s 
undertaking of July 23, 2013, signed in lieu of a s.37 order and consenting to practice 
restrictions, came back into effect. 
 
On January 30, 2017, Dr. Peirovy filed a motion for leave to appeal the decision of the 
Divisional Court to the Court of Appeal and for an order staying the decision of the Divisional 
Court pending leave, and if leave is granted, pending the disposition of the appeal. 

On April 13, 2017, the Court of Appeal granted Dr. Peirovy’s motion for leave to appeal. Upon 
leave being granted by the Court of Appeal, the College consented to the adjournment of the 
scheduled penalty hearing of September 6 and 7, 2017, until such time as the appeal was 
determined. 
On August 30, 2017, Dr. Peirovy entered into a supplemental undertaking agreeing to only 
engage in professional encounters at his practice at 298 Sheppard Avenue East, Toronto, in 
“Exam Room 1”. 
 
On May 3, 2018, the Court of Appeal allowed Dr. Peirovy’s appeal of the Divisional Court 
decision and restored the decision of the Discipline Committee. Therefore, the decision of the 
Discipline Committee is in effect.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Notice of Appeal
Hearing Date(s): January 12-16, January 27, 2015. Penalty hearing date October 26 and 30, 2015,

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: April 22, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Javad Peirovy to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 22, 2020:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Peirovy engaged in professional misconduct including with respect to delegation of controlled acts, and his compliance with his undertakings with the College. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Peirovy will not delegate any controlled acts, nor permit individuals who are not regulated health professionals to conduct assessments, take histories, or conduct physical examinations of patients, until the completion of professional education.

Dr. Peirovy will engage in professional education in the appropriate delegation of controlled acts.

Dr. Peirovy will undergo a reassessment of his practice 3 months after the completion of professional education.

 

Source: Member
Active Date: April 22, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: May 8, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)