THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 6:47:21 AM
Almohri, Huda
CPSO#:
84823
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Apr 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Sultan Qaboos University College of Medi, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
100 International Boulevard
Toronto ON M9W 6J6
Phone: (416) 675-4530 Ext. 42811
Fax: (416) 213-4206
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:25 Sep 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:13 Sep 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Microbiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HUDA ALMOHRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALMOHRI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Apr 2007 |