THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/06/23 21:45:01 PM
McGuire, Anna Louise
CPSO#:
84757
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
29 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
25 Mar 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Suite 7115, 2775 Laural Street, VGH, DHCC, Vancouver, BC V5Z 1M9
Date Received: 29 Jul 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Thoracic Surgery |
Effective:30 Sep 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Thoracic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Thoracic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 29 Mar 2015
CF - Thoracic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Mar 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 29 Jul 2015 |