THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:01:33 AM
Ashworth, Allison Betty
CPSO#:
83277
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Apr 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Pahl, Allison Betty (used until: 17 Sep 2007 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Cancer Centre of Southeastern
Ontario
Kingston General Hospital
25 King Street West
Kingston ON K7L 5P9
Phone: (613) 544-2631
Fax: (613) 548-1355
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:25 May 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALLISON BETTY ASHWORTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASHWORTH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 08 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
Queen's University, 09 Jun 2009 to 08 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
Queen's University, 09 Jun 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 18 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 May 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Apr 2013 |