skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 28/09/22 18:17:16 PM

LaBerge, Robert Clarence

CPSO#: 82516

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
105 - 770 Broadview Ave
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 680-9092
Fax: (613) 680-9093 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Department of Pediatrics
401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2664
Fax: 613-738-4878
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: R.C. LaBerge Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. LaBerge ( CPSO# 82516 )
Dr. L. LaBerge ( CPSO# 86862 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Department of Paediatrics
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Business Address:
105 - 770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone Number: (613) 729-1324


Corporation Name: Dr. Lauren LaBerge Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 10 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. LaBerge ( CPSO# 82516 )
Dr. L. LaBerge ( CPSO# 86862 )

Business Address:
209 - 770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone Number: (613) 680-9092

Business Address:
102 - 170 East Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 3C6
Phone Number: (705) 253-0881

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4774

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROBERT CLARENCE LABERGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LABERGE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2009