skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 05/12/22 9:36:57 AM

Ismail, Laila R M

CPSO#: 82309

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French, Italian

Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bank Medical Center
Suite 1
1935 Bank street
Ottawa ON  K1V 8A3
Phone: (613)521-2391 Ext. 131 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Laila Ismail Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Ismail ( CPSO# 82309 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LAILA R M ISMAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISMAIL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 11 Apr 2005 to 15 Apr 2005
PEAP - R - Paediatric Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 21 Sep 2009
EL - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 22 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 14 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 15 Nov 2010 to 14 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Apr 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2014