THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 5:33:56 AM
Siddiqui, Naveed Tahir
CPSO#:
82092
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Aug 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
03 Aug 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of Karachi, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
19- 104 Dept Anesthesia
600 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5270
Fax: (416) 586-8664
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:03 Aug 2007 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 28 Feb 2005
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 27 Jul 2007
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Jul 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Aug 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 May 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Mar 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 07 Mar 2013 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Mar 2013 |
|
Active |