THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 22:09:17 PM
Zaza, Khaled Osman Abdel-Fattah
CPSO#:
81879
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Mar 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jan 2024
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Division of Radiation Oncology
25 King St W
Kingston ON K7L 5P9
Phone: (613) 544-2631 Ext. 4173
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:15 Aug 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KHALED OSMAN ABDEL-FATTAH ZAZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAZA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Sep 2004 to 28 Feb 2005
International Specialist Physician - Radiation Oncology
Queen's University, 30 May 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Feb 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 May 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Mar 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Mar 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Apr 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Mar 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Mar 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Mar 2020 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jan 2024 |