THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 10:52:21 AM
Mahmud, Aamer
CPSO#:
81278
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Mar 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
27 Mar 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of the Punjab, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Cancer Center of South Eastern Onta
KHSC. Department of Oncology
25 King Street West
Kingston ON K7L 5P9
Phone: (613) 544-2631 Ext. 6645
Fax: (613) 548-2399
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:27 May 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Mar 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Mar 2009 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Mar 2009 |
|
Active |