THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 10:18:54 AM
Hanna, Timothy Paul
CPSO#:
81017
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Nov 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Nov 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Cancer Centre of Southeastern ON
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Radiation Oncology
25 King Street West
Kingston ON K7L 5P9
Phone: (613) 544-2631 Ext. 4144
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TIMOTHY PAUL HANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANNA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Nov 2012 |