skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 27/06/22 20:40:23 PM

Lapena, Uliran Elsa Olanday

CPSO#: 80956

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino, Tagalog

Education: University of The East Philippines, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2-136 Orton Park Rd
Scarborough ON  M1G 3H1
Phone: 905-837-0777
Fax: 1-877-718-0285 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

1792 Liverpool Rd
Pickering ON  L1V 4G6
Canada
Phone: 905-837-0777
Fax: 1-877-718-0285
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

1792 Liverpool Rd
Pickering ON  L1V 4G6
Canada
Phone: 9058370777
Fax: 18777180285
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Elsa Lapena Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. U. Lapena ( CPSO# 80956 )
Dr. H. Lapena ( CPSO# 85736 )

Business Address:
1792 Liverpool Rd
Pickering ON  L1V 4G6
Phone Number: 9058370777


Corporation Name: Dr. Hilario Lapena Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. U. Lapena ( CPSO# 80956 )
Dr. H. Lapena ( CPSO# 85736 )

Business Address:
Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 721-6895

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ULIRAN ELSA OLANDAY LAPENA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAPENA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 22 Sep 2004
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2006