THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 2:29:26 AM
Ribas, Carlos Sebastian
CPSO#:
78256
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
22 Jun 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: National University of Cordoba, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
205-385 Wilson St E
Ancaster Cardiology
Ancaster ON L9G 2C1
Phone: 905-648-6883
Fax: 905-648-1288
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Joseph Brant Hospital |
Burlington |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:27 Nov 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:27 Nov 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Cardiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Cardiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Feb 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Feb 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Aug 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Apr 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Apr 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 2016 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Jun 2016 |
|
Active |