THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 3:14:07 AM
Thangaroopan, Arulnmozhy
CPSO#:
72646
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Jul 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 602
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P6
Phone: (905) 953-7917
Fax: (905) 953-0046
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:30 Sep 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ARULNMOZHY THANGAROOPAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THANGAROOPAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 10 Mar 2003 to 06 Apr 2003
EL - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Mar 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 Apr 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 2004 |