skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/10/21 8:37:37 AM

Long, Briar Allyn

CPSO#: 71670

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Jan 2003
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Jan 2003

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Guelph
Student Health Services
J T Powell Building
Guelph ON  N1G 2W1
Phone: (519) 824-4120 Ext. 52131
Fax: 519 821-2308 Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Homewood Health Centre Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:31 Dec 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRIAR ALLYN LONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2003