THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/10/23 7:54:11 AM
Zufelt, Kirk William
CPSO#:
67007
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Sep 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Group Health Centre
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6B 1Y5
Phone: (705) 759-1234
Fax: (705) 541-2231
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sault Area Hospital |
Sault Ste. Marie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KIRK WILLIAM ZUFELT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZUFELT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 08 May 1998
Resident 5 - Pediatric Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1994 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Sep 1997 |