skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 03/12/21 21:07:10 PM

Karnis, Megan Michelle Freebury

CPSO#: 66995

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Freebury, Megan Michelle (used until: 23 Apr 1998 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
ONE Fertility
3210 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3T1
Phone: (905) 634-4440
Fax: (905) 639-3810 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hamilton Health Sciences
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 1A4
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

200 - 4271 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2P 2X7
Canada
Phone: (519) 650-0011
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Megan Freebury Karnis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Karnis ( CPSO# 66995 )

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
ONE Fertility
3210 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3T1
Phone Number: (905) 634-4440


Corporation Name: Amin and Karnis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 05 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Karnis ( CPSO# 66995 )
Dr. S. Amin ( CPSO# 73115 )
Dr. M. Faghih ( CPSO# 78171 )

Business Address:
3210 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3T1
Phone Number: (905) 333-6355


Corporation Name: Akinsooto, Amin, Faghih and Karnis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 25 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Karnis ( CPSO# 66995 )
Dr. S. Amin ( CPSO# 73115 )
Dr. M. Faghih ( CPSO# 78171 )
Dr. V. Akinsooto ( CPSO# 88164 )

Business Address:
Suite 200
4271 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2P 2X7
Phone Number: (519) 650-0011

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MEGAN MICHELLE FREEBURY KARNIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARNIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998