THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 4:59:50 AM
Khawar, Muhammad Khalid
CPSO#:
65808
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Aug 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Feb 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of the Punjab, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Scott Street Medical Clinic
A2C - 387 Scott Street
St Catharines ON L2M 3W2
Phone: (905) 646-8383
Fax: (905) 646-0202
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MUHAMMAD KHALID KHAWAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAWAR is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 1992 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1993 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 2013 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Jan 2021 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Feb 2021 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: December 2, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)