THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 21:51:24 PM
Buehner, Sharon Elizabeth
CPSO#:
65582
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Jul 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6B 1Y5
Phone: (705) 759-1234
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sault Area Hospital |
Sault Ste. Marie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jun 1994 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:05 Dec 1995 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHARON ELIZABETH BUEHNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUEHNER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1992 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jul 1993 |