THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 9:45:32 AM
Ali, Syed Nasir
CPSO#:
63113
MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of
27 Apr 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Aug 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: University of Karachi, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: S. N. Ali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 16 2022
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: November 23, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On December 5, 2022, Bluewater Health notified the College, pursuant to s.85.5(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, and s.33(a) and (b) of the Public Hospitals Act, that the hospital appointment held by Dr. Syed N. Ali at Bluewater Health was revoked, effective from November 23, 2022.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:18 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
CF - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Sep 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Aug 1992 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Aug 1992 |
Revocation by Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal |
Effective: 27 Apr 2023 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
Decision Date: 09 Dec 2021
Summary:
The Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal found that Dr. Ali engaged in conduct unbecoming a physician by sexually assaulting the complainant, a professional colleague, in 1999. The Tribunal further found that Dr. Ali engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by ignoring a conflict of interest in participating in this colleague’s privileges hearings at their hospital.
Following a penalty hearing the panel reserved its decision on penalty. The panel’s reasons for decision on penalty were released on May 16, 2022. The Tribunal ordered that:
- The Registrar revoke Dr. Ali’s certificate of registration, effective immediately;
- Dr. Ali attend before the Tribunal to be reprimanded; and
- Dr. Ali pay costs to the College in the amount of $124,440 within 90 days of the date of this Order.
Appeal
On May 18, 2022, Dr. Ali filed a Notice of Appeal to the Divisional Court from the OPSDT’s decision. Pursuant to s. 25(1) of the Statutory Powers Procedure Act, RSO 1990, c. S.22, the decision of the OPSDT was stayed pending the outcome of the appeal.
On April 26, 2023, the Divisional Court released its decision dismissing Dr. Ali’s appeal.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Motion: 2020-05-22; Merits: 2020-11-09 to 13; 2021-02-24 to 26; 2021-03-08 to 9, 12; 2021-04-13 and 26; Penalty: 2022-03-11; Reprimand: 2023-08-08